VA HB2791 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Personnel Act; appointments, promotion, and tenure based upon merit and fitness. Clarifies that, except as otherwise provided by law, all appointments and promotions to and tenure in positions in the service of the Commonwealth shall be based solely upon merit and fitness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Personnel Act; appointments, promotion, and tenure based upon merit and fitness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Pending question, not ordered (17-Y 22-N) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Pending question, not ordered (4-Y 36-N) (Y: 4 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (18-Y 22-N) (Y: 18 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Stricken from Senate calendar (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion to reconsider motion to strike from the calendar agreed to (38-Y 1-N 1-A)) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Motion to pass by for the day rejected (18-Y 22-N 1-A) (Y: 17 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 47-N) (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (12-Y 9-N) (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateStricken from Senate calendar (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenatePending question, not ordered (17-Y 22-N)
2019-02-21SenateMotion to reconsider motion to strike from the calendar agreed to (38-Y 1-N 1-A))
2019-02-21SenateMotion to recommit to committee rejected (18-Y 22-N)
2019-02-21SenatePending question, not ordered (4-Y 36-N)
2019-02-21SenateMotion to strike from the calendar rejected (19-Y 21-N)
2019-02-21SenateMotion to pass by for the day rejected (18-Y 22-N 1-A)
2019-02-21SenateRead third time
2019-02-20SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 19107327D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (52-Y 47-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (52-Y 47-N)
2019-02-04HousePrinted as engrossed 19100028D-E
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2791E
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-01-31HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (12-Y 9-N)
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-28HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19100028D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
222901(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2791
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2791+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2791E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2791S1+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1103V0019+HB2791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0094+HB2791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2495+HB2791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0155+HB2791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2791+HB2791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0967HB2791+HB2791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0971HB2791+HB2791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0968HB2791+HB2791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0969HB2791+HB2791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0970HB2791+HB2791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0972HB2791+HB2791
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0973HB2791+HB2791

Bill Comments

feedback