VA HB2785 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers. Allows a retired law-enforcement officer to continue to receive his service retirement allowance during a subsequent period of employment by a local school division as a school security officer. The provisions of the bill are contingent on funding in a general appropriations act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Retirement System; retired law-enforcement officers employed as school security officers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Appropriations
2019-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19105270D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
511155(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback