VA HB2784 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Robert O. Norris Bridge and Statewide Special Structure Fund. Establishes the Robert O. Norris Bridge and Statewide Special Structure Fund to be used for the purpose of funding maintenance and replacement of large and unique structures. The bill also requires the Commonwealth Transportation Board to (i) undertake a comprehensive review of the current and future condition of pavements and bridges in the Commonwealth; (ii) dedicate a portion of certain funds to the Robert O. Norris Bridge and Statewide Special Structure Fund; and (iii) evaluate the feasibility of using the Public-Private Transportation Act of 1995 to design, build, operate, and maintain two bridges to replace the Robert O. Norris Bridge on State Route 3 and the Downing Bridge on U.S. Route 360. This bill is identical to SB 1749.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Robert O. Norris Bridge and Statewide Special Structure Fund; created.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0349)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 349 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2784ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Transportation (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2784H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute from Appropriations agreed to 19105915D-H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee amendments from Transportation rejected
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105915D-H1
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseAssigned App. sub: Transportation
2019-01-29HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-29HouseReported from Transportation with amendments (21-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Transportation
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19104051D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2784
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2784+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2784H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2784ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0349+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1902V0014+HB2784
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H19V0045+HB2784
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0208V0005+HB2784
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0073+HB2784
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2492+HB2784
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S11V0139+HB2784
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0724HB2784+HB2784
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0743HB2784+HB2784

Bill Comments

feedback