VA HB2783 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0497)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Living shorelines; loans to businesses. Authorizes a local government that has a funding program that provides low-interest loans or other incentives for the establishment of living shorelines to provide such incentives to businesses. The bill includes bed-and-breakfast operations, campgrounds, restaurants, and businesses that use working waterfronts among the eligible businesses, and it requires such a business to be located within a locality that is in the Rural Coastal Virginia Community Enhancement Authority in order to be eligible for loan funding. Current law authorizes the provision of such incentives only to individual residents of the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Living shorelines; loans to businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0497)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 497 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2783ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateRead third time
2019-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (13-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2783H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19106078D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19106078D-H1
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #3
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19104155D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
621229.5(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2783
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2783+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2783H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2783ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0497+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0103V0012+HB2783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0046+HB2783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2189+HB2783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2263+HB2783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S01V0088+HB2783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0772HB2783+HB2783
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0822HB2783+HB2783

Bill Comments

feedback