VA HB278 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-24 - Read first time
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Home/electronic incarceration program; payment to defray costs. Changes from mandatory to optional the current requirement that the director or administrator of a home/electronic incarceration program charge an offender or accused a fee for participating in the program in order to pay for the cost of home/electronic incarceration equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Home/electronic incarceration program; payment to defray costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-24HouseRead first time
2020-01-22HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-15HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (7-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned Courts sub: Criminal
2019-12-30HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-12-30HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100666D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
531131.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback