VA HB2778 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Petition for vacatur and expungement of convictions and police and court records of human trafficking victims. Allows any person who was a human trafficking victim at the time of an offense that led to a criminal charge or conviction of certain crimes to petition the court to vacate such conviction and expunge the police and court records related to such conviction or to expunge the police and court records related to such charge. The bill provides that there is a rebuttable presumption that a person's participation in an offense was a result of having been a victim of human trafficking if there is official documentation, defined in the bill, of the petitioner's status as a victim of human trafficking at the time of the offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Human trafficking victims; petition for vacatur and expungement of convictions, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19101748D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192392.2:1(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.4(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback