VA HB2776 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Income tax; modification for certain companies; grants; Page County. Adds Page County to the list of qualified localities in which a company may invest to become eligible for income tax modification. Under current law, a company is eligible for such modification if, among other things, it either (i) invests at least $5 million in new capital investment in a qualified locality and creates at least 10 jobs paying at least 150 percent of the minimum wage in a qualified locality or (ii) creates at least 50 jobs paying at least 150 percent of the minimum wage in a qualified locality. This bill is identical to SB 1428.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax, state; modification for certain companies, grants, Page County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance (18-Y 2-N) (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0262)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 262 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-19 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 19, 2019
2019-02-15SenateSigned by President
2019-02-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-15HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2776ER)
2019-02-15HouseEnrolled
2019-02-13SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Finance (12-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 8-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (90-Y 8-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-01HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Finance (18-Y 2-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2019-01-18HousePresented and ordered printed 19104907D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152958.2:01(n/a)See Bill Text
581405.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback