VA HB277 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-02 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Community service work in lieu of payment of fines and costs. Provides that a court may permit an inmate to earn credits against any fines and court costs imposed against him by performing community service. Under current law, credits may be earned only before or after imprisonment.
Title
Court fines and costs; community work in lieu of payment during imprisonment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025) | |
2020-03-02 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 25 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-24 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 2, 2020 | |
2020-02-24 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 24, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB277ER) |
2020-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (11-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB277H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 20106260D-H1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-22 | House | Incorporates HB965 (Kilgore) |
2020-01-22 | House | Committee substitute printed 20106260D-H1 |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102588D |
Same As/Similar To
HB965 (Similar To) 2020-01-22 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
SB736 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0188)
SB736 (Same As) 2020-03-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0188)