VA HB2754 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
When headlights to be lighted. Requires every vehicle in operation to display lighted headlights. Currently headlights are required to be lighted only (i) from sunset to sunrise; (ii) during any other time when, because of rain, smoke, fog, snow, sleet, insufficient light, or other unfavorable atmospheric conditions, visibility is reduced to a degree whereby persons or vehicles on the highway are not clearly discernible at a distance of 500 feet; and (iii) whenever windshield wipers are in use as a result of fog, rain, sleet, or snow. The bill removes provisions making the failure to display lighted headlights when windshield wipers are in use as a result of fog rain, sleet, or snow (a) a secondary offense, (b) subject to no demerit points being assessed, and (c) not a defense to any claim for personal injury or recovery of medical expenses for injuries sustained in a motor vehicle accident.
Title
Motor vehicles; when headlights to be lighted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) (Y: 4 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Transportation |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee failed to recommend reporting (4-Y 6-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2019-01-17 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104344D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 2 | 1012 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1029.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 1030 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
46 | 2 | 111 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |