VA HB275 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Local electoral boards; meetings, proceedings, and records. Provides that the general registrar shall determine a reasonable charge, not to exceed the statutory amount set for copies of court records, for copies made of local electoral board books, papers, and records.
Title
Electoral boards, local; meetings, proceedings, and records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-25 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0395) | |
2014-03-31 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 395 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB275ER) |
2014-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-25 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-25 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendment (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (90-Y 4-N) |
2014-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-31 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (20-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2013-12-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2013-12-31 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14102557D |