VA HB2743 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Child protective services; investigations and family assessments; contact information. Requires any individual who is the subject of a child abuse or neglect investigation or family assessment to notify the local department of social services prior to changing his place of residence and provide the local department with the address of his new residence. The bill also requires the Department of Social Services to document and report to the Governor and the General Assembly by November 1, 2020, the number of individuals who notified a local department of social services of a change in address and provided updated contact information between July 1, 2019, and July 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child protective services; investigations and family assessments, contact information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0436)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 436 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2743ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19SenateRead third timeg7050
2019-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateReported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateAssigned Rehab sub:
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 19103848D-E
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2743E
2019-02-01HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-17HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-17HousePresented and ordered printed 19103848D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6321505(n/a)See Bill Text
6321506(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2743
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2743+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2743E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2743ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0436+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H12V0077+HB2743
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2184+HB2743
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2258+HB2743
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S09V0103+HB2743
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0772HB2743+HB2743
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0822HB2743+HB2743

Bill Comments

feedback