VA HB2731 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Lyme disease; disclosure of information to patients. Requires every laboratory reporting the results of a test for Lyme disease ordered by a health care provider in an office-based setting to include, together with the results of such test provided to the health care provider, a notice stating that the results of Lyme disease tests may vary and may produce results that are inaccurate and that a patient may not be able to rely on a positive or negative result from such test. Such notice shall also include a statement that health care providers are encouraged to discuss Lyme disease test results with the patient for whom the test was ordered. The bill also provides that a laboratory that complies with the provisions of the act shall be immune from civil liability absent gross negligence or willful misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lyme disease; disclosure of information to patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-08SenateAssigned Education sub: Health Professions
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2731H1
2019-02-01HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105570D-H1
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105570D-H1
2019-01-29HouseReported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (10-Y 0-N)
2019-01-21HouseAssigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
2019-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 19103490D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5412963.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback