VA HB2727 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Inmates; local correctional facilities; community service work in lieu of payment for fines and court costs. Requires courts to provide an option to any person upon whom a fine and costs have been imposed to discharge all or part of the fine or costs by earning credits for the performance of community service work. The bill provides that if such person is incarcerated in a local correctional facility or regional jail facility, such person may perform community service work during his period of confinement as authorized by the court. Under current law, providing this option is discretionary and credits may be earned only before or after imprisonment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Inmates; community service work in lieu of payment for fines and court costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 4-N) (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 4-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-16HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-16HousePresented and ordered printed 19104318D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192354(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback