VA HB2723 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Portable electronics insurance; notices. Authorizes an insurer or vendor of portable electronics insurance to issue notices and correspondence by mail or by electronic means. The bill provides that a consumer's provision of an electronic mail address to such an insurer or vendor shall be considered to be the customer's consent to receive notices and correspondence by electronic means so long as a disclosure to that effect is provided to the customer within 30 days following the purchase of portable electronics insurance.
Title
Portable electronics insurance; issuing and correspondence.
Sponsors
Del. Tony Wilt [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0523) | |
2019-03-18 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 523 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2723ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2723H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105210D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105210D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (19-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned C & L sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-16 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-16 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104405D |