VA HB2719 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; small employers. Revises the definition of "small employer" for purposes of group health insurance policies to provide that an individual who performs any service for remuneration under a contract of hire for (i) a corporation in which he is a shareholder or an immediate family member of a shareholder or (ii) a limited liability company in which he is a member, regardless of the number of members of the limited liability company, shall be deemed to be an employee of the corporation or the limited liability company. The measure provides that a health insurance issuer shall not be required to issue more than one group health plan for each employer identification number issued by the Internal Revenue Service for a business entity, without regard to the number of shareholders or members of such business entity. This bill is identical to SB 1475.
Title
Health insurance; small employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0383) | |
2019-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 383 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2719ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Printed as engrossed 19104317D-E |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2719E |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with amendments (20-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104317D |