VA HB2716 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Elections and voter registration; early voting; same day voter registration. Provides for early voting beginning the twenty-first day prior to any general election, the seventh day prior to any special election held on a date other than the date of a general election, and the seventh day prior to any primary election and ending at 5:00 p.m. on the Saturday immediately preceding the election, during which any registered voter may vote without providing a reason or making a prior application for an absentee ballot. During the early voting period, any person who is qualified to register to vote shall be permitted to register to vote and cast a ballot in person in the office of the general registrar or at another location in the county or city approved by the electoral board. The bill also permits such persons to do so on the day of the election. The bill removes the current provisions for voting absentee in person but retains those provisions for voting an absentee ballot by mail, including the application requirement and the list of statutory reasons that allow a registered voter to vote absentee by mail.
Title
Elections and voter registration; early voting, same day voter registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-21 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104144D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 420.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 612 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 700 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 700.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 707 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |