VA HB2705 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-15 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Historic rehabilitation tax credit. Provides that the $5 million per year limit on the amount of historic rehabilitation tax credit that may be claimed by each taxpayer, which currently expires on January 1, 2019, shall apply to all future taxable years.
Title
Historic rehabilitation; limit on tax credit that may be claimed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N 1-A) (Y: 94 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-15 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0025) | |
2019-02-15 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 25 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-12 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, February 19, 2019 | |
2019-02-12 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 12, 2019 |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-11 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2705ER) |
2019-02-11 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (25-Y 15-N) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Finance (12-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 2-N 1-A) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Finance (20-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-15 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104391D |