VA HB27 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-12 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle weight limit extensions. Provides that vehicle weight limit extensions apply also to interstate highways that are simultaneously designated as state primary or secondary highways.
Title
Vehicle weight limits; extensions apply also to interstates designated as state primary highways.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Cole [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | Left in Transportation |
2014-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2013-11-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2013-11-27 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100003D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB27 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB27+hil |