VA HB2699 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0230)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Foundation for the Humanities; task force; membership. Adds five members to the task force established to assist the Virginia Foundation for the Humanities in its work regarding the history of formerly enslaved African Americans in Virginia. The additional members are the executive director of the Virginia Tourism Authority or his designee, the chairman of the board of trustees of the Virginia Outdoors Foundation or his designee, and three nonlegislative citizen members appointed by the Governor, at least one of whom is required to be the president of a historically black college or university located in the Commonwealth.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Humanities, Virginia Foundation for the; adds members to task force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Education (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0230)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 230 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2699ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Education (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-15HousePresented and ordered printed 19104555D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2312219(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback