VA HB2695 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Crime victim rights; definition of victim. Expands the definition of "victim," for purposes of the Crime Victim and Witness Rights Act (§19.2-11.01 et seq.), to include (i) a person who has suffered physical, psychological, or economic harm as a direct result of the commission of identity theft, brandishing a firearm, indecent liberties by children, indecent exposure, using profane or threatening language over the telephone, or a delinquent act that would be one of such misdemeanor offenses if committed by an adult; (ii) a spouse or child of such a person; (iii) a parent or legal guardian of such a person who is a minor; (iv) a current or former foster parent or other person who has or has had physical custody of such a person who is a minor, for six months or more or for the majority of the minor's life; or (v) a spouse, parent, sibling, or legal guardian of such a person who is physically or mentally incapacitated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime victim rights; expands definition of victim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-28HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #4
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 19104463D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19211.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback