VA HB2694 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Property Owners' Association Act; association meetings; notice by e-mail. Allows members of property owners' associations to elect to receive notice of meetings of the association by e-mail in lieu of the current requirement that such notice be sent by United States mail or hand delivered, provided that in the event that such electronic mail is returned as undeliverable, notice is subsequently sent by United States mail.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Owners' Association Act; association meetings, notice by email.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (30-Y 10-N) (Y: 30 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0368)
2019-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 368 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-21 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-19HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2694ER)
2019-02-19HouseEnrolled
2019-02-14SenatePassed Senate (30-Y 10-N)
2019-02-14SenateRead third time
2019-02-13SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 1-N 1-A)
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-01-31SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-01-30HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HousePrinted as engrossed 19104198D-E
2019-01-29HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2694E
2019-01-29HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-29HouseRead second time
2019-01-28HouseRead first time
2019-01-24HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2019-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 19104198D

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2694
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2694+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2694E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2694ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0368+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1102V0014+HB2694
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H11V0069+HB2694
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1996+HB2694
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2042+HB2694
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0135+HB2694
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0547HB2694+HB2694
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0660HB2694+HB2694

Bill Comments

feedback