VA HB269 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia National Guard; state active duty pay. Provides that all members of the Virginia National Guard who are called into state active duty be paid an amount not less than that prescribed for a member with the rank of E-6 who has over 18 years of service.
Title
Virginia National Guard; state active duty pay.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-01-29 | House | Assigned App. sub: Public Safety |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-26 | House | Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102711D |