VA HB2686 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Board of zoning appeals; vote requirement. Changes the vote requirement for certain board of zoning appeals decisions from a majority of the membership to a majority of the membership present and voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Zoning Appeals, Board of; changes vote requirement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-03 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 50-N) (Y: 48 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (22-Y 18-N) (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Defeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 38-N) (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 3, 2019
2019-04-03HouseCommunicated to Governor
2019-04-03HouseVOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 50-N)
2019-04-03HouseHouse rejected Governor's recommendation (48-Y 50-N)
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-03-21HouseGovernor's recommendation received by House
2019-02-28 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-28HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 28, 2019
2019-02-21SenateSigned by President
2019-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-21HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2686ER)
2019-02-21HouseEnrolled
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate (22-Y 18-N)
2019-02-18SenateReconsideration of defeated action agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateDefeated by Senate (19-Y 21-N)
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Local Government (10-Y 1-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 38-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (61-Y 38-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns (19-Y 2-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-22HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2019-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 19103623D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1522308(n/a)See Bill Text
1522312(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2686
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2686+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2686ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0702V0023+HB2686
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H07V0029+HB2686
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2488+HB2686
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0095+HB2686
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2686+HB2686
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0749HB2686+HB2686
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0751HB2686+HB2686
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0752HB2686+HB2686
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3398+HB2686

Bill Comments

feedback