VA HB2685 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Virginia Military Survivors and Dependents Education Program; eligibility. Extends the benefits of the Virginia Military Survivors and Dependents Education Program to the spouse or child of a veteran with at least a 90 percent permanent, service-related disability. Under current law, the spouse or child would be eligible for benefits only if the veteran's disability was incurred during military operations against terrorism, on a peacekeeping mission, as a result of a terrorist act, or in any armed conflict. Under the provisions of the bill, eligibility for stipends from the Virginia Military Survivors and Dependents Education Fund is unchanged. This bill is identical to SB 1173.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virginia Military Survivors and Dependents Education Program; eligibility.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N) (Y: 1 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N) (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 491 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2685ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-24HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-24HouseConference report agreed to by House (96-Y 0-N)
2019-02-24SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-24 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Dunnavant, Petersen, Newman
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Torian, Bell, Richard P., Davis
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-20SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-20SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 98-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (1-Y 98-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-18SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-18SenateAmendment by Senator Newman agreed to
2019-02-18SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-18SenateRead third time
2019-02-15SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-15SenateCommittee substitute rejected 19106586D-S1
2019-02-15SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-07SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-07SenateCommittee substitute printed 19106586D-S1
2019-02-07SenateReported from Education and Health with substitute (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseAssigned App. sub: Higher Education
2019-01-23HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-23HouseReported from Education (20-Y 1-N)
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
2019-01-21HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 19104451D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231608(n/a)See Bill Text
231608.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2685
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2685+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2685S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2685ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0491+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0901V0010+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0034+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0206V0024+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H02V0063+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2487+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0198+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0355+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2685+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0748HB2685+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3081+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0863HB2685+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1133HB2685+HB2685
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3370+HB2685

Bill Comments

feedback