VA HB2681 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0257)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Historical African American cemeteries; City of Hampton. Adds seven cemeteries in Hampton to the list of cemeteries for which qualified organizations may receive funds from the Department of Historic Resources for the care of historical African American cemeteries and graves. The cemeteries are Bassette's Cemetery, containing 212 eligible graves, Elmerton Cemetery, containing 339 eligible graves, Good Samaritan Cemetery, containing 37 eligible graves, Pleasant Shade Cemetery, containing 29 eligible graves, Queen Street Cemetery, containing 14 eligible graves, the Tucker Family Cemetery, containing 15 eligible graves, and Union Street Cemetery, containing 125 eligible graves. This bill is identical to SB 1128.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historical African American cemeteries; adds seven cemeteries in City of Hampton.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (17-Y 0-N) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0257)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 257 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-04 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-04HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019
2019-02-22SenateSigned by President
2019-02-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-22HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2681ER)
2019-02-22HouseEnrolled
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-19HouseReconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
2019-02-19HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-19HouseSenate amendment agreed to by House (97-Y 1-N)
2019-02-19HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-15SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-15SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-13SenateReported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from General Laws and Technology with amendment (14-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2019-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HousePassed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseReconsideration of passage agreed to by House
2019-02-04HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-02-01HousePrinted as engrossed 19102878D-E
2019-02-01HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2681E
2019-02-01HouseCommittee amendments agreed to
2019-02-01HouseRead second time
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-14HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2019-01-14HousePresented and ordered printed 19102878D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1012211.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2681
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2681+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2681E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2681ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0257+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0102V0013+HB2681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H01V0036+HB2681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2178+HB2681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2252+HB2681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S12V0149+HB2681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0363+HB2681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2681+HB2681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB2681+HB2681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3079+HB2681
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3080+HB2681

Bill Comments

feedback