VA HB2661 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Saltwater recreational fishing license; exceptions; commercial license holder. Exempts from the requirements of obtaining a saltwater recreational fishing license a holder of a commercial fishing license and one immediate family member who is accompanying the commercial licensee. The bill prohibits any person fishing pursuant to the exception from fishing on board a vessel that contains gear that is required to be licensed by the Virginia Marine Resources Commission.
Title
Saltwater recreational fishing license; exceptions, commercial license holder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned ACNR sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2019-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104287D |