VA HB2659 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Bail bondsman; surrender of principal; deposit. Requires a bail bondsman on a bond in a recognizance who surrenders his principal for any reason other than a summons to show cause issued by the court for which the defendant is to appear to deposit with the clerk or magistrate the greater of 10 percent of the amount of the bond or $50 at the time of the application for a capias. The bill allows the bondsman to petition the court within 15 days to show cause as to why the bondsman is entitled to the amount deposited. If the court finds that there was sufficient cause to surrender the principal, the court shall return the deposited funds to the bondsman. If the court finds that surrender of the principal was unreasonable, the court shall return the deposited funds to the principal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bail bondsman; surrender of principal, deposit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 205 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2659ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 19103714D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192149(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback