VA HB2659 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Bail bondsman; surrender of principal; deposit. Requires a bail bondsman on a bond in a recognizance who surrenders his principal for any reason other than a summons to show cause issued by the court for which the defendant is to appear to deposit with the clerk or magistrate the greater of 10 percent of the amount of the bond or $50 at the time of the application for a capias. The bill allows the bondsman to petition the court within 15 days to show cause as to why the bondsman is entitled to the amount deposited. If the court finds that there was sufficient cause to surrender the principal, the court shall return the deposited funds to the bondsman. If the court finds that surrender of the principal was unreasonable, the court shall return the deposited funds to the principal.
Title
Bail bondsman; surrender of principal, deposit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0205) | |
2019-03-05 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 205 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-18 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2659ER) |
2019-02-14 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-24 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-11 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103714D |