VA HB2648 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0216)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Crime victim rights; notice of release of defendant found unrestorably incompetent or acquitted by reason of insanity. Provides that, upon the request of the victim of a crime, the Commissioner of Behavioral Health or his designee shall notify the victim of the release of a defendant who was found to be unrestorably incompetent or who was acquitted by reason of insanity and committed to inpatient hospitalization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crime victim rights; notice of release of defendant found unrestorably incompetent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0216)
2019-03-05 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 216 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-18 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-18HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 18, 2019
2019-02-14SenateSigned by President
2019-02-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-14HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2648ER)
2019-02-14HouseEnrolled
2019-02-11SenatePassed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRead third time
2019-02-08SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
2019-01-28SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-28SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-01-25HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-25HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
2019-01-24HousePrinted as engrossed 19103613D-E
2019-01-24HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB2648E
2019-01-24HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-01-24HouseRead second time
2019-01-23HouseRead first time
2019-01-21HouseReported from Courts of Justice with amendment (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-11HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-11HousePresented and ordered printed 19103613D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19211.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2648
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2648+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2648E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2648ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0216+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0030+HB2648
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0027+HB2648
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV1882+HB2648
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0213+HB2648
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0488HB2648+HB2648
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0492HB2648+HB2648

Bill Comments

feedback