VA HB264 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Oyster-planting ground; transfer or assignment of lease to locality. Authorizes a person holding a lease of oyster-planting ground to transfer or assign the lease to a locality or other political subdivision of the Commonwealth, retroactive to July 1, 1966. Current law allows the holder of such lease to transfer or assign the lease to a resident of the Commonwealth or an authorized corporation.
Title
Oyster-planting ground; transfer or assignment of lease to locality.
Sponsors
Del. Cheryl Turpin [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Sen. Jennifer Boysko [D] | Del. Paul Krizek [D] |
Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Delores McQuinn [D] | Del. David Reid [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (9-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-15 | House | Assigned ACNRsub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources |
2018-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101517D |