VA HB263 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Grand larceny; threshold. Increases from $500 to $2,000 the threshold amount of money taken or value of goods or chattel taken at which the crime rises from petit larceny to grand larceny. The bill increases the threshold by the same amount for the classification of certain property crimes.
Title
Grand larceny; threshold.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2020-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB995-Lindsey) by voice vote |
2020-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101679D |
Same As/Similar To
HB995 (Similar To) 2020-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0089)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 108.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 145.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 150 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 152.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 162 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 181 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 181.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 182 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 186.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 187.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 188 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 195 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 195.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 197 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 23 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.37 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 80 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 81 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 95 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 97 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 289 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 290 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 386.16 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
29 | 1 | 553 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB263 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB263+hil |