VA HB2627 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Voir dire examination of persons called as jurors; criminal case. Allows the court and counsel for either party in a criminal case to (i) ask potential jurors any relevant question to ascertain whether the juror can sit impartially in either the guilt or sentencing phase of the case and (ii) inform any potential juror as to the potential range of punishments to ascertain if the person or juror can sit impartially in the sentencing phase of the case.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Voir dire examination of persons called as jurors; criminal case.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseLeft in Courts of Justice
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-10HousePresented and ordered printed 19102551D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
192262.01(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback