VA HB2625 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Recounts; rules of procedure; multiple simultaneous recounts. Requires a recount court to issue a written order setting out the rules of procedures fixed by it for the conduct of a recount prior to the commencement of such recount. The bill also directs the State Board of Elections to promulgate standards and instructions for conducting simultaneous recounts of two or more elections in a single election district.
Title
Recounts; rules of procedure, multiple simultaneous recounts.
Sponsors
Del. Joesph Lindsey [D] | Del. Dawn Adams [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] |
Del. Kenneth Plum [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-17 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0382) | |
2019-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 382 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-27 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-27 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-20 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2625ER) |
2019-02-20 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-01-31 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-25 | House | Reported from Privileges and Elections (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2019-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-01-10 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19103933D |