VA HB262 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Inquiry and report of immigration status; certain victims or witnesses of crimes. Prohibits law-enforcement officers from inquiring into the immigration status of a person who (i) reports that he is a victim of a crime or a parent or guardian of a minor victim of a crime or (ii) is a witness in the investigation of a crime or the parent or guardian of a minor witness to a crime. However, a law-enforcement officer is not prohibited from making such an inquiry if it is necessary for the enforcement or implementation of certain criminal provisions or if the parent or guardian has been arrested for, has been charged with, or is being investigated for a crime against the minor victim.
Title
Immigration status; prohibiting inquiry into status of certain victims or witnesses of crimes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 42-N) (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 5-N) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) (Y: 57 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 5-N) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0273) | |
2020-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 273 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020 | |
2020-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB262ER) |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-21 | House | VOTE: Adoption (54-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20108387D-S1 (54-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 19-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB262S1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108387D-S1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108387D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (9-Y 6-N) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-02-06 | House | VOTE: Passage (57-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-06 | House | Read third time and passed House (57-Y 42-N) |
2020-02-05 | House | Printed as engrossed 20101667D-E |
2020-02-05 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB262E |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-02-05 | House | Read second time |
2020-02-04 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (14-Y 5-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (6-Y 1-N) |
2020-01-26 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101667D |