VA HB262 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
One-stop small business permitting program; fees for veterans. Exempts veterans from paying the Department of Business Assistance's handling fee when establishing a small business through the one-stop small business permitting program.
Title
One-stop small business permitting program; exemption of handling fee for veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-12 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0697) | |
2010-04-12 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 697 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-11 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-09 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-09 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB262ER) | |
2010-03-09 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-24 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-16 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-16 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-15 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB262H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10105031D-H1 | |
2010-02-15 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-14 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-12 | House: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-11 | House: Committee substitute printed 10105031D-H1 | |
2010-02-11 | House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-11 | House: Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-02-11 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-15 | House: Assigned GL sub: #3 ABC/Gaming | |
2010-01-11 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2010-01-11 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102464D |