VA HB2616 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Courts of Justice
Pending: House Courts of Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Juveniles; trial as adult. Increases from age 14 to age 16 the minimum age at which a juvenile must be tried as an adult in circuit court for murder or aggravated malicious wounding or for certain charges requiring notice of intent to try such juvenile as an adult by the attorney for the Commonwealth. In order to be tried as an adult in circuit court for charges that require notice of intent to proceed with trial as an adult by the attorney for the Commonwealth, the bill requires that (i) a report of the juvenile be prepared by probation services or other qualified agency and (ii) the attorney for the Commonwealth review such report prior to filing his notice of intent to proceed with a preliminary hearing for trial of such juvenile as an adult.
Title
Juveniles; increases minimum age at which a juvenile must be tried as an adult.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-16 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Courts of Justice |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104339D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 1 | 241 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 269.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 269.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
16 | 1 | 277.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |