VA HB2609 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Criminal Justice Services; school resource officers; school administrators; training. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services (Department) to establish and every full-time or part-time law-enforcement officer employed as a school resource officer after July 1, 2020, to comply with compulsory minimum training standards for law-enforcement officers serving as school resource officers. The bill requires the training provided by the Department pursuant to such standards to be specific to the role and responsibility of a law-enforcement officer working with students in a school environment and to be available throughout the Commonwealth. The bill requires each school board to ensure that every public school it supervises employs at least one school administrator who has completed, either in-person or online, school safety training for public school personnel conducted by the Virginia Center for School and Campus Safety, unless such training is not available online. This bill is identical to SB 1130.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School resource officers; compulsory minimum training standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-24 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 3-N) (Y: 93 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Senate acceded to request for second conference committee (34-Y 6-N) (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N) (Y: 0 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-22 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 22-N) (Y: 76 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N) (Y: 19 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0487)
2019-03-18 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 487 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2609ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-24HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (93-Y 3-N)
2019-02-24HouseConference report agreed to by House (93-Y 3-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (38-Y 2-N)
2019-02-23HouseSecond Conference Committee substitute printed 19107733D-H2
2019-02-23SenateSenators: Carrico, Locke, Suetterlein
2019-02-23SenateSecond conferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-23SenateSenate acceded to request for second conference committee (34-Y 6-N)
2019-02-23HouseDelegates: Jones, J.C., Bell, Richard P., Leftwich
2019-02-23HouseSecond conferees appointed by House
2019-02-23HouseHouse requested second conference committee
2019-02-23SenateConference report rejected by Senate (0-Y 39-N)
2019-02-22HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (95-Y 2-N)
2019-02-22HouseConference report agreed to by House (95-Y 2-N)
2019-02-22SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-22SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-22 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Carrico, Locke, Suetterlein
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Jones, J.C., Bell, Richard P., Leftwich
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate substitute with amendment rejected by House 19107281D-S1 (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21SenatePassed Senate with substitute with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendment HB2609S1
2019-02-21SenateAmendment by Senator Stanley agreed to
2019-02-21SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-21SenateRead third time
2019-02-20SenatePassed by for the day
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 19107281D-S1
2019-02-20SenateReading of substitute waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateCommittee substitute printed 19107281D-S1
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-14SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-14SenateReported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee on Education and Health
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (76-Y 22-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House (76-Y 22-N)
2019-02-04HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB2609H1
2019-02-04HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19105909D-H1
2019-02-04HouseRead second time
2019-02-01HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-31HouseRead first time
2019-01-30HouseCommittee substitute printed 19105909D-H1
2019-01-30HouseReported from Education with substitute (19-Y 3-N)
2019-01-25HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (9-Y 0-N)
2019-01-18HouseAssigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Education
2019-01-09HousePresented and ordered printed 19103503D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
91184(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2609
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2609+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2609H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2609S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2609H2+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2609ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0487+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0902V0021+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H09V0084+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2430+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S04V0243+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0375+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2609+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0958HB2609+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3257+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1000HB2609+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3296+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1066HB2609+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1122HB2609+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1124HB2609+HB2609
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3369+HB2609

Bill Comments

feedback