VA HB2608 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Individual and corporate income tax credit; employers of National Guard members and self-employed National Guard members. Provides for taxable years 2019 through 2023 a nonrefundable tax credit against individual and corporate income taxes for (i) wages paid by an employer to an employee who is a Virginia National Guard member or (ii) income of a self-employed National Guard member attributable to his business. The amount of the credit shall be 25 percent if such member was in a military pay status for 65 days or more during such taxable year or 15 percent if such member was in a military pay status for 45 days or more during such taxable year. The credit shall not be allowed if such member was in a military pay status for less than 45 days during such taxable year The bill allows a taxpayer to carry unused credits over for up to five taxable years.
Title
Income taxes, state and corporate; tax credit for employers of National Guard members.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Finance with amendments (19-Y 0-N) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Finance with amendments (19-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (7-Y 1-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2019-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19104148D |