VA HB2600 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act. Provides that a telephone solicitor and the seller on whose behalf or for whose benefit a telephone solicitation call offering or advertising a seller's property, goods, or services is made or initiated are jointly and severally liable for violations of the Virginia Telephone Privacy Protection Act (?§59.1-510 et seq.). The measure establishes a presumption that a telephone solicitation call offering or advertising a seller's property, goods, or services is made or initiated on behalf of or for the benefit of the seller and provides that this presumption may be rebutted if it is shown by clear and convincing evidence that (i) the seller did not retain or request the telephone solicitor to make telephone solicitation calls on the seller's behalf or for the seller's benefit and (ii) such telephone solicitation calls were made by the telephone solicitor without the seller's knowledge or consent. The measure removes a provision that authorized the Commissioner of the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to inquire into possible violations of the Act and contains technical amendments. This bill is identical to SB 1041.
Title
Va. Telephone Privacy Protection Act; joint liability of seller & telephone solicitor for violation.
Sponsors
Sen. John Bell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0256) | |
2019-03-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 256 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-02-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 21, 2019 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2600ER) |
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2600H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19106295D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19106295D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (17-Y 2-N) |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2019-01-09 | House | Presented and ordered printed 19102586D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 1 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 512 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 513.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |