VA HB26 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB26
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Voter registration; close of registration records. Reduces the period of time that registration records must be closed before a general or primary election from 21 days to 13 days. The bill adjusts other deadlines to reflect this change. The period of time that the registration records must be closed before a special election remains the same.
Title
Voter registration; close of registration records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-31 | House | Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-13 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Elections |
2019-11-19 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2019-11-19 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100510D |
Same As/Similar To
HB26 (Carry Over) 2020-01-31 - Continued to 2021 in Privileges and Elections by voice vote
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
24 | 2 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 416 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
24 | 2 | 420.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB26 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB26+hil |