VA HB26 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Pawnbrokers; allowable late fees. Provides that a pawnbroker may charge a late fee, not to exceed 10 percent of the amount loaned, for each item that is not claimed by the pledged due date as long as the pawner is notified of the fee on the pawn ticket.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pawnbrokers; allowable late fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 3-N) (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N) (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 9-N) (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-09 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0212)
2018-03-09 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 212 (effective 7/1/18)
2018-03-02 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018
2018-03-02HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018
2018-02-28SenateSigned by President
2018-02-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2018-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB26ER)
2018-02-26HouseEnrolled
2018-02-22SenatePassed Senate (37-Y 3-N)
2018-02-22SenateRead third time
2018-02-21SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2018-02-19SenateReported from General Laws and Technology (14-Y 1-N)
2018-02-01SenateReferred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
2018-02-01SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2018-01-31HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (86-Y 9-N)
2018-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House (86-Y 9-N)
2018-01-30HousePrinted as engrossed 18101012D-E
2018-01-30HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB26E
2018-01-30HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2018-01-30HouseRead second time
2018-01-29HouseRead first time
2018-01-25HouseReported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
2018-01-18HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
2018-01-17HouseAssigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
2017-11-28HouseReferred to Committee on General Laws
2017-11-28HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101012D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5414009(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+sum+HB26
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB26+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB26E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+HB26ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+ful+CHAP0212+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H1103V0005+HB0026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+H11V0010+HB0026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+HV0173+HB0026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+S12V0176+HB0026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0596HB0026+HB0026
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?181+vot+SV0625HB0026+HB0026

Bill Comments

feedback