VA HB26 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-20 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 26 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-20 - Incorporated by Courts of Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic cigarettes; prohibit purchase, etc., by minors. Provides that minors may not purchase or possess electronic cigarettes and that no person may sell electronic cigarettes to a minor. The bill defines an electronic cigarette as any electronic device that can provide an inhaled dose of nicotine to the individual inhaling from the device and the components of such device, including liquid nicotine.
Title
Electronic cigarettes; prohibit purchase, etc., by minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-20 | House | Incorporated by Courts of Justice |
2014-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB218-Albo) by voice vote |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2013-11-26 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-11-26 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100912D |
Same As/Similar To
HB218 (Similar To) 2014-03-31 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0394)
Subjects
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+sum+HB26 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?141+ful+HB26+hil |