VA HB259 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1121)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1121)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Unrestorably incompetent defendant; competency report. Provides that in cases where a defendant is likely to remain incompetent for the foreseeable future due to an ongoing and irreversible medical condition and prior medical or educational records are available to support the diagnosis, a competency report may recommend that the court find the defendant unrestorably incompetent to stand trial, and the court may proceed with the disposition of the case based on such recommendation. Under current law, the defendant is required to undergo treatment to restore his competency before the court can find a defendant unrestorably incompetent to stand trial. The bill also provides that such person who is found unrestorably incompetent to stand trial shall be prohibited from purchasing, possessing, or transporting a firearm.
Title
Unrestorably incompetent defendant; competency report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree to #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (92-Y 1-N) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (3-Y 97-N) (Y: 3 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree to #2 (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (92-Y 1-N) (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (3-Y 97-N) (Y: 3 N: 97 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1121) | |
2020-04-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 1121 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-03-20 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020 | |
2020-03-20 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 20, 2020 |
2020-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-03-18 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB259ER) |
2020-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2020-03-07 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Agree to #2 (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (95-Y 0-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Reconsideration of conference report agreed to by House |
2020-03-04 | House | VOTE: Agree To (92-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-04 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 1-N) |
2020-03-04 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senators: Mason, Deeds, McDougle |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2020-02-24 | House | Delegates: Simon, Mullin, Adams, L.R. |
2020-02-24 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2020-02-24 | House | House acceded to request |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (3-Y 97-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 20108211D-S1 (3-Y 97-N) |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB259S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 20108211D-S1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20108211D-S1 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Printed as engrossed 20101848D-E |
2020-01-27 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB259E |
2020-01-27 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2019-12-30 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-12-30 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101848D |
Same As/Similar To
SB670 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0299)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 308.1:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 169.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |