VA HB259 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Payment of wages; remedies; penalties. Expands the information an employer is required to provide to its employees when wages are paid to include the name and address of the employer, the number of hours worked during the pay period, and the rate of pay. The measure prohibits an employer from taking retaliatory action against an employee, and an employee who has been discharged or discriminated against may file a complaint with the Department of Labor and Industry and seek appropriate remedies. The measure authorizes the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to institute proceedings on behalf of an employee to enforce compliance with the prohibition on retaliatory actions and collect on behalf of the employee three times the amount of unpaid wages and three times the amount of wages the employee would have earned absent the prohibited discrimination. The Commission is further authorized to assess and collect a civil penalty of no less than $2,500 and no more than $10,000 per employee subject to the prohibited discrimination. Finally, the measure authorizes the Department to conduct investigations on behalf of other employees if it learns that other employees of the same employer are not being paid wages.
Title
Payment of wages; remedies, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 8-N) (Y: 10 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2018-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 3-N) |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned App. sub: Commerce, Agriculture, Natural Resources & Technology |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (10-Y 8-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred from Commerce and Labor by voice vote |
2018-01-02 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2018-01-02 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102439D |