VA HB2586 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0617)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prostitution and sex trafficking; offenses involving a minor; penalties. Provides that any person who commits an act of aiding prostitution or illicit sexual intercourse or using a vehicle to promote prostitution or unlawful sexual intercourse, when such act involves a minor, is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Under current law, such acts are punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill adds the two new felony offenses to (i) the definition of "violent felony" for the purposes of sentencing guidelines, (ii) the definition of barrier crimes for the purposes of background checks for employees or volunteers providing care to children or the elderly or disabled, (iii) the definition of predicate criminal acts for street gangs, (iv) the definition of racketeering activity under the Virginia Racketeer Influence and Corrupt Organization Act, (v) the list of violations that a multi-jurisdiction grand jury is responsible for investigating, and (vi) the list of offenses requiring registration in the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry. The bill also adds felony prostitution and felony human trafficking offenses to the definition of "violent felony" for the purposes of sentencing guidelines. The bill also provides that each violation of commercial sex trafficking is a separate and distinct felony. The bill as introduced was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prostitution and sex trafficking; offenses involving a minor, penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0617)
2019-03-19 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 617 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-03-11 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-03-11HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019
2019-03-09SenateSigned by President
2019-03-07HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-07HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2586ER)
2019-03-07HouseEnrolled
2019-02-23HouseVOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23HouseConference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23SenateConference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-23 Conference: Amended by conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenators: Obenshain, Stuart, Howell
2019-02-21SenateConferees appointed by Senate
2019-02-21HouseDelegates: Bell, Robert B., Ransone, Herring
2019-02-21HouseConferees appointed by House
2019-02-21HouseHouse acceded to request
2019-02-21SenateSenate requested conference committee
2019-02-21SenateSenate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED #2 (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N)
2019-02-21HouseReconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House
2019-02-21HouseVOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N 1-A)
2019-02-21HouseSenate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 97-N 1-A)
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2019-02-20SenatePassed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-20SenateEngrossed by Senate as amended
2019-02-20SenatePassed by temporarily
2019-02-20SenateCommittee amendment agreed to
2019-02-20SenateReading of amendment waived
2019-02-20SenateRead third time
2019-02-19SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-18SenateReported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
2019-02-11SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-02-11SenateReported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-02-06SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-05HouseVOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-05HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04HouseRead second time and engrossed
2019-02-03HouseRead first time
2019-02-01HouseReported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N)
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
2019-01-29HouseAssigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee for Courts of Justice
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104381D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171805(n/a)See Bill Text
182347(n/a)See Bill Text
182350(n/a)See Bill Text
182357.1(n/a)See Bill Text
18246.1(n/a)See Bill Text
182513(n/a)See Bill Text
192215.1(n/a)See Bill Text
192392.02(n/a)See Bill Text
91902(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2586
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2586+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2586ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0617+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H0801V0123+HB2586
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H08V0103+HB2586
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2396+HB2586
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S03V0246+HB2586
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S05V0384+HB2586
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0834HB2586+HB2586
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0913HB2586+HB2586
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3221+HB2586
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3226+HB2586
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0979HB2586+HB2586
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV3336+HB2586
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV1087HB2586+HB2586

Bill Comments

feedback