VA HB2586 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0617)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0617)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prostitution and sex trafficking; offenses involving a minor; penalties. Provides that any person who commits an act of aiding prostitution or illicit sexual intercourse or using a vehicle to promote prostitution or unlawful sexual intercourse, when such act involves a minor, is guilty of a Class 6 felony. Under current law, such acts are punishable as a Class 1 misdemeanor. The bill adds the two new felony offenses to (i) the definition of "violent felony" for the purposes of sentencing guidelines, (ii) the definition of barrier crimes for the purposes of background checks for employees or volunteers providing care to children or the elderly or disabled, (iii) the definition of predicate criminal acts for street gangs, (iv) the definition of racketeering activity under the Virginia Racketeer Influence and Corrupt Organization Act, (v) the list of violations that a multi-jurisdiction grand jury is responsible for investigating, and (vi) the list of offenses requiring registration in the Sex Offender and Crimes Against Minors Registry. The bill also adds felony prostitution and felony human trafficking offenses to the definition of "violent felony" for the purposes of sentencing guidelines. The bill also provides that each violation of commercial sex trafficking is a separate and distinct felony. The bill as introduced was a recommendation of the Virginia State Crime Commission.
Title
Prostitution and sex trafficking; offenses involving a minor, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED #2 (0-Y 99-N) (Y: 0 N: 99 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N 1-A) (Y: 0 N: 97 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0617) | |
2019-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 617 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2586ER) |
2019-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-23 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-23 | House | Conference report agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-23 | Conference: Amended by conference committee | |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, Stuart, Howell |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2019-02-21 | House | Delegates: Bell, Robert B., Ransone, Herring |
2019-02-21 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2019-02-21 | House | House acceded to request |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate insisted on amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED #2 (0-Y 99-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 99-N) |
2019-02-21 | House | Reconsideration of Senate amendment agreed to by House |
2019-02-21 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (0-Y 97-N 1-A) |
2019-02-21 | House | Senate amendment rejected by House (0-Y 97-N 1-A) |
2019-02-21 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2019-02-03 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (18-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19104381D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 1 | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 347 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 350 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 357.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 46.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 513 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 215.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
19 | 2 | 392.02 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |