VA HB2585 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Sheriffs; standard motor vehicle markings. Requires that all marked motor vehicles used by sheriffs' offices conspicuously display on each front side door of such vehicles the words "Sheriff's Office" or "Sheriff" and the name of the county or city. Current law requires such vehicles to be solid dark brown or some other solid color, with a reflectorized gold, five-point star on each front side door and requires that the lettering on such stars say "Sheriff's Office" or "Sheriff" in a half-circle above the Seal of the Commonwealth or the seal of the jurisdiction. Current law also requires that the name of the county or city be placed in a half-circle below the Seal and the words "Sheriff's Office" or "Sheriff" be placed on the rear of the trunk.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sheriffs; standard motor vehicle markings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N) (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-25 - House - House: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 2-N) (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-08 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0298)
2019-03-08 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 298 (effective 7/1/19)
2019-02-27 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019
2019-02-27HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 27, 2019
2019-02-20SenateSigned by President
2019-02-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-02-20HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB2585ER)
2019-02-20HouseEnrolled
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2019-02-15SenateRead third time
2019-02-14SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
2019-02-12SenateReported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N)
2019-02-04SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-04SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2019-02-01HouseVOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 5-N)
2019-02-01HouseRead third time and passed House (91-Y 5-N)
2019-01-31HousePrinted as engrossed 19104778D-EH1
2019-01-31HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute with amendment HB2585EH1
2019-01-31HouseAmendment by Delegate Gilbert agreed to
2019-01-31HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 19104778D-H1
2019-01-31HouseRead second time
2019-01-30HousePassed by for the day
2019-01-29HouseRead first time
2019-01-25HouseCommittee substitute printed 19104778D-H1
2019-01-25HouseReported from Militia, Police and Public Safety with substitute (19-Y 2-N)
2019-01-24HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (5-Y 0-N)
2019-01-15HouseAssigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
2019-01-09HouseReferred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
2019-01-09HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102659D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1521610(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+sum+HB2585
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2585+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2585H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2585EH1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+HB2585ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+ful+CHAP0298+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H1502V0011+HB2585
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+H15V0017+HB2585
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+HV2119+HB2585
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+S07V0097+HB2585
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0662HB2585+HB2585
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?191+vot+SV0706HB2585+HB2585

Bill Comments

feedback