VA HB2574 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School Divisions of Innovation; performance-based assessments. Allows a local school board, when applying for its school division to be designated as a School Division of Innovation, to apply to the Board of Education (the Board) to replace certain Standards of Learning assessments with performance-based assessments. The bill requires the Board to determine if the local school board has the capacity to administer and score performance-based assessments and provides criteria for such determination. The bill requires any proposed performance-based assessment to be an adequate replacement of the relevant Standards of Learning assessment and requires students to demonstrate the knowledge and skills required by the relevant Standards of Learning and one or more of critical thinking, creativity, collaboration, communication, or citizenship. The standards of learning assessments eligible for replacement are Virginia Studies and Civics and Economics.
Title
School Divisions of Innovation; performance-based assessments for Va. Studies & Civics & Economics.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE #2 (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House |
2019-02-04 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-01 | House | Printed as engrossed 19101899D-E |
2019-02-01 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB2574E |
2019-02-01 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2019-02-01 | House | Read second time |
2019-01-31 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-30 | House | Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-18 | House | Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101899D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1 | 212.33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 253.13:3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |