VA HB2571 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-05 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Interstate 81 Corridor Transportation Commission; funding. Creates the Interstate 81 Corridor Transportation Commission, embracing the localities located in Planning Districts 3, 4, 5, 6, and 7. The Commission would be responsible for allocating any revenues dedicated to it by the General Assembly for improvements within the Interstate 81 corridor.
Title
Interstate 81 Corridor Improvement Transportation Commission; created.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-05 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2019-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-15 | House | Assigned App. sub: Transportation |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19102937D |