VA HB2569 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation of child-care services and facilities in certain counties. Provides that if a zoning administrator in a locality that has, by ordinance, allowed a zoning administrator to use an administrative process to issue zoning permits for family day homes receives a written objection to an application for a permit to operate a family day home within 30 days of notification of such application, the zoning administrator shall issue the permit if the family day home meets all the other criteria for issuance of the permit or may deny the permit, or, if required to do so by local ordinance, refer the permit to the local governing body for consideration. This bill is identical to SB 1094.
Title
Family day homes; zoning permits.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0380) | |
2019-03-14 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 380 (effective 7/1/19) | |
2019-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 26, 2019 | |
2019-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 4, 2019 |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-02-22 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB2569ER) |
2019-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2019-02-19 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-19 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Amendment by Senator agreed to |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read third time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2019-02-05 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-05 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2019-02-04 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB2569H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 19105974D-H1 |
2019-02-04 | House | Read second time |
2019-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee substitute printed 19105974D-H1 |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 0-N) |
2019-01-16 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2019-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2019-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/19 19101245D |